Financial history FRIENDS OF YSGOL MAES HYFRYD

Charity Number: 1136363
Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £3.46k £9.34k £3.17k £501 £1.50k
Total expenditure £16.08k £16.11k £2.47k £1.28k £996
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A