Financial history OMBERSLEY SPIRE AND CHURCH APPEAL

Charity number: 1131675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £123.10k £69.50k £28.65k £4.49k £30.05k
Total expenditure £73.33k £125.10k £25.08k £60 £57.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A