WHITBY, SCARBOROUGH AND RYEDALE DISABILITY ACTION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WhitbyDAG provides information, advice and practical support to enable disabled people to live independently. We run Welfare benefits, Mobility Equipment Hire, Information and Befriending services and provide supported educational, social, leisure and volunteering activites.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,955 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- WHITBY AND DISTRICT DISABLEMENT ACTION GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Hutchinson | Chair | 09 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Elizabeth Jobling | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Martin Everitt | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Watt | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Weightman | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Williams | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA LESLEY BOOTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.54k | £161.57k | £267.72k | £73.13k | £76.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.28k | £130.58k | £122.99k | £146.00k | £108.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £32.01k | £11.37k | £17.73k | £1.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/04/2012 as amended on 29 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
A) TO BENEFIT DISABLED PEOPLE, ELDERLY PEOPLE AND CARERS IN WHITBY, SCARBOROUGH AND RYEDALE BY PROVIDING SERVICES WHICH FACILITATE INDEPENDENCE IN DAILY LIVING; B) TO PROMOTE ACCESS TO ALL PUBLIC BUILDINGS FOR DISABLED PEOPLE AND ELDERLY PEOPLE; C) TO ENHANCE THE INTEGRATION INTO THE COMMUNITY OF DISABLED PEOPLE, ELDERLY PEOPLE AND CARERS BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE SERVICES TO RELIEVE THEIR NEEDS; D) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF DISABLED PEOPLE, ELDERLY PEOPLE AND CARERS, PROVIDERS OF SERVICES AND THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH INFORMATION AND ADVICE SERVICES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ingrid Flute Room
First Floor
The Coliseum
Victoria Place
WHITBY
North Yo
- Phone:
- 01947511118
- Email:
- info@whitbydag.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window