ORANGUTAN LAND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ORANGUTAN LAND TRUST SUPPORTS EFFORTS TO PROVIDE SUSTAINABLE SOLUTIONS FOR THE LONG TERM SURVIVAL OF THE ORANGUTAN IN THE WILD BY ENSURING SAFE AREAS OF FOREST FOR THEIR CONTINUED EXISTENCE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Indonesia
- Malaysia
Governance
- 28 September 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr David Chivers | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Thijs Pasmans | Trustee | 23 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lone Droscher Nielsen | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Murdoch | Trustee | 30 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.23k | £55.64k | £52.87k | £80.66k | £129.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.38k | £33.56k | £28.88k | £76.45k | £101.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2024 | 359 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE "OBJECTS") ARE TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF THE NATURAL HABITAT SUITABLE FOR THE SURVIVAL AND GROWTH OF THE WORLD ORANG-UTAN POPULATION ("HABITAT") THROUGH:- (1) SUPPORT FOR THE PURCHASE, LEASING, CONSERVATION AND CULTIVATION OF LAND APPROPRIATE FOR USE BY ORANG-UTANS AS THEIR HABITAT; (2) FINDING, SURVEYING AND SECURING PERMANENT RELEASE SITES FOR BOTH WILD AND REHABILITATED ORANG-UTANS, INCLUDING TAKING MEASURES TO PROTECT THOSE SITES INDEFINITELY; (3) WORKING WITH PALM OIL COMPANIES TO SET ASIDE MORE THAN THE REQUIRED CONSERVATION AREAS AND TO DEVELOP BUFFER ZONES AND WILDLIFE CORRIDORS TO PROTECT SUCH HABITAT; (4) SUPPORTING THE CREATION OF FOREST RANGERS AND ANTI-LOGGING PROGRAMMES IN SUCH HABITAT; (5) SUPPORTING THE DEVELOPMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF FIRE FIGHTING CAPABILITIES TO PROTECT SUCH HABITAT; (6) PROMOTING REFORESTATION AND REGENERATION ACTIVITIES IN SUCH HABITAT; (7) SUPPORTING AND ENCOURAGING FOREST BASED CARBON REDUCTION PROJECTS IN ORDER TO PROTECT SUCH HABITAT; (8) SUPPORTING SUSTAINABLE HARVESTING OF FORESTS (TIMBER AND NONTIMBER FOREST PRODUCTS) IN SUCH HABITAT IN COOPERATION WITH LOCAL COMMUNITIES; (9) FINDING, SURVEYING AND SECURING RIVER ISLANDS FOR THE PENULTIMATE STEP IN THE REHABILITATION PROCESS OF ORANG-UTANS, AND TAKING MEASURES TO PROTECT THOSE SITES INDEFINITELY; (10) FINDING, SURVEYING AND SECURING RIVER ISLANDS TO SERVE AS PERMANENT SANCTUARY FOR RESCUED AND REHABILITATED ORANG-UTANS NOT SUITABLE FOR TOTAL RELEASE INTO THE WILD, SUCH AS THOSE WITH CHRONIC DISEASE OR DISABILITIES, AND TAKING MEASURES TO PROTECT THOSE SITES INDEFINITELY; (11) FINDING, SURVEYING AND SECURING NEW FOREST SITES FOR USE BY ORANG-UTANS UNDERGOING REHABILITATION AND PROVIDING INFRASTRUCTURE FOR SUCH SITES, SUCH AS SECURITY POSTS, FEEDING PLATFORMS AND FENCING; (12) EDUCATION, OUTREACH AND EMPOWERMENT IN COMMUNITIES LIVING IN ORANG-UTAN HABITAT AREAS TO ENCOURAGE ALTERNATIVES TO THE CONVERSION OF FOREST TO PALM OIL AND SIMILAR CASH CROPS; (13) LOBBYING LOCAL AND NATIONAL AUTHORITIES TO PROTECT ORANG-UTAN HABITAT; (14) CO-OPERATING WITH AND SUPPORT OTHER ORGANISATIONS, WHETHER SITUATED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE, ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE, CONSERVE AND CULTIVATE THE NATURAL HABITAT OF ORANG-UTANS; AND (15) TO DO SUCH OTHER THINGS TO ADVANCE THE PROTECTION AND CONSERVATION OF SUCH ORANG-UTAN HABITAT AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DE
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Park Farm Cottages
Walton Road
Drakelow
BURTON-ON-TRENT
DE15 9TY
- Phone:
- 01283353607
- Email:
- info@forests4orangutans.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window