CITY YEAR UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit to promote the education (including social and physical training) of people under the age of 25 years in the UK, including by organising and assisting with the provision of volunteers to schools to act as tutors, mentors and role models to students.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£2,617,220
Donations and legacies | £1.60m | |
Charitable activities | £1.01m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £804 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,594,529
Raising funds | £306.84k | |
Charitable activities | £2.29m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £11,182 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £306.84k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.29m | |
Retained for future use | £22.69k |
People

48 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
103 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 August 2009: Standard registration
- CITY YEAR LONDON (Previous name)
- CITY YOUTH LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Davies | Chair | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Merary Soto-Saunders | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Lynas | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|||||
James Terry | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bethia McNeil | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Sachin Jogia | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kasey Elizabeth Hooper | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Williams | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Flaherty | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNMAURA CONNOLLY | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.65m | £2.68m | £2.77m | £3.10m | £2.62m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.68m | £2.65m | £2.69m | £3.07m | £2.59m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £87.86k | £143.78k | £62.69k | £11.18k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.53m | £1.71m | £1.54m | £1.83m | £1.60m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £10.83k | £1.40k | £0 | £55.29k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.10m | £958.81k | £1.23m | £1.21m | £1.01m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £804 | |
|
Income - Other | £10.55k | £1.04k | £575 | £205 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.40m | £2.36m | £2.43m | £2.77m | £2.29m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £280.41k | £291.30k | £252.29k | £302.00k | £306.84k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.88k | £9.34k | £9.84k | £10.62k | £11.70k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £1.06k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £20.63k | £461 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £1 | £0 | £1 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Other assets | £386.26k | £786.47k | £681.37k | £624.73k | £588.16k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £127.42k | £474.97k | £287.52k | £197.44k | £138.18k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 04 August 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 04 August 2021 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 01 June 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 01 June 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/10/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN HE UNITED KINGDOM IN SUCH WAYS AS THE DIRECTORS THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY ORGANISING AND ASSISTING WITH THE PROVISION OF VOLUNTEERS TO SCHOOLS TO ACT AS TUTORS, MENTORS AND ROLE MODELS TO STUDENTS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
200A PENTONVILLE ROAD
LONDON
N1 9JP
- Phone:
- 02070142680
- Email:
- info@cityyear.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window