CHRISTIAN MEDICAL FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Medical Fellowship is an association of over 4,000 Christian doctors in the UK and Republic of Ireland in all branches of medicine, and over 1000 student members. It took over the activities of registered charity 1039823 on 1 Jan 2010. We are linked with around 60 similar inter-denominational bodies worldwide through the International Christian Medical and Dental Association (ICMDA).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,491,182
Donations and legacies | £1.25m | |
Charitable activities | £198.23k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £41.36k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,645,141
Raising funds | £78.62k | |
Charitable activities | £1.57m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £78.62k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.57m |
People

29 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ovril Tomlinson | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Baines | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christopher Summerton | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stefanie McRoy | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alice Smith | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ellie McBain | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alana Atkinson | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wesley Kai-Xian McLoughlin | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Robert J Moots | Trustee | 03 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paula Busuulwa | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Charles Lipscomb | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James | Trustee | 16 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Euan McRorie | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maura Brigid Lyons | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|||||
David Khoo | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.47m | £1.44m | £1.33m | £1.31m | £1.49m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.45m | £1.22m | £1.16m | £1.42m | £1.65m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.26m | £1.34m | £1.24m | £1.12m | £1.25m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £160.91k | £49.18k | £48.57k | £152.29k | £198.23k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £42.78k | £43.33k | £40.94k | £35.52k | £41.36k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £49.50k | £17.40k | £83.68k | £7.00k | £42.34k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.38m | £1.16m | £1.10m | £1.35m | £1.57m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £63.42k | £61.50k | £58.40k | £69.74k | £78.62k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £37.18k | £33.22k | £34.70k | £39.85k | £39.99k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £3.82k | £3.84k | £4.47k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.42m | £1.39m | £1.39m | £1.38m | £1.35m | |
|
Long-term investments | £910.00k | £910.00k | £910.00k | £910.00k | £910.00k | |
|
Other assets | £359.77k | £546.82k | £690.12k | £542.21k | £428.45k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £549.61k | £489.13k | £465.97k | £422.62k | £438.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
3.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH INCLUDING THE PROMOTION OF BIBLICAL CHRISTIAN BELIEFS AND VALUES WORLD-WIDE 3.2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION WORLD-WIDE 3.3. THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING, POVERTY AND DISTRESS WORLD-WIDE THE OBJECTS TO BE CARRIED OUT AS AN EXPRESSION OF THE BIBLICAL TRUTHS SET OUT IN CLAUSE 5 HEREOF)
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHRISTIAN MEDICAL FELLOWSHIP
6 MARSHALSEA ROAD
LONDON
SE1 1HL
- Phone:
- 02072349660
- Email:
- info@cmf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window