IYF UK LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the life of and help young people to participate in society as independent, mature and responsible individuals. To improve the conditions of life of young people. To promote Christianity and education primarily, but not exclusively, amoungst young people. To relieve those in need by reason of youth, age, ill health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bromley
- Camden
- City Of London
- Croydon
- Greenwich
- Lambeth
- Southwark
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 01 March 2010: Standard registration
- 22 July 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | 18 May 2011 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | 04 April 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 2 FEBRUARY 2010 AND REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 12 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: 1.1 PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS 1.2 THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE 2 TO ADVANCE CHRISTIANITY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE 3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE 4 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE 5 SUCH OTHER PURPOSES THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window