THE BUSINESS BRIDGE INITIATIVE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BUSINESS BRIDGE DEMOCRATISES ACCESS TO BUSINESS EDUCATION. WE BRING HIGH QUALITY COURSES AT LOW COST TO TENS OF THOUSANDS OF DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE ACROSS THE WORLD, THEREBY INCREASING THEIR CHANCES OF BUSINESS SUCCESS. WE ARE ACTIVE IN SOUTH AFRICA AND INDIA, WHERE WE WORK WITH 20-55 YEAR OLDS WHO HAVE COMPLETED SECONDARY EDUCATION AND ARE INVOLVED IN AN EARLY STAGE BUSINESS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- South Africa
Governance
- 24 August 2009: Standard registration
- 30 August 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2010 | 30/06/2011 | 30/06/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.93k | £134.30k | £109.80k | £112.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.19k | £106.09k | £141.41k | £101.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 27 November 2014 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 27 November 2014 | 27 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | 06 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | 06 April 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE EDUCATION, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE DELIVERY OF A PROGRAMME OF HIGH QUALITY BUSINESS EDUCATION AND TRAINING THROUGHOUT THE WORLD; AND 3.2 TO PROMOTE AND CONDUCT RESEARCH, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, INTO ALL ASPECTS OF BUSINESS EDUCATION, INCLUDING THE PUBLICATION OF SUCH RESEARCH TO THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window