BRADFORD ACTION FOR REFUGEES LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities include help, advice & guidance to the refugee & asylum seeking community. Children and families group, raising awareness of refugees and asylum seekers. Volunteering project.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
Governance
- 03 August 2009: Standard registration
- 08 May 2013: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 08 May 2013: Funds transferred to 1078816 NORTHERN REFUGEE CENTRE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.99k | £231.42k | £267.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.25k | £251.46k | £279.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 17 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 17 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 17 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 17 November 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 10 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 03 August 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM, THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND MIGRANTS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, ADVOCACY, TRAINING, RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO IMPROVE THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window