Accounts and annual returns JUST 1 LIFE LIMITED

Charity number: 1137152
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 11 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 11 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 02 July 2024 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 11 May 2023 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 30 June 2023 61 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 10 May 2022 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 14 July 2021 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 14 July 2021 75 days late Download Open in new window