Financial history JUST 1 LIFE LIMITED

Charity number: 1137152
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £63.27k £51.69k £23.57k £26.10k £23.70k
Total expenditure £72.53k £50.80k £44.99k £28.96k £26.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A