JUST 1 LIFE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Just 1 Life is a small charity that aims to improve lives, relieve suffering and to provide education opportunities for children and vulnerable people within their own communities. We offer hope, opportunities and care by sponsoring specific projects, currently in a children's home in Kenya and a school for disabled young people in Indonesia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- India
- Indonesia
- Kenya
- Tanzania
Governance
- 29 July 2010: Standard registration
- STARS OF HOPE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr N Speechley | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mr N Matinyarare | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Thomas De La Mare | Trustee | 22 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Leona Powell | Trustee | 22 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
NOLA DONACHIE | Trustee | 28 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER RUTH HIRSCHL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW JAMES DOMINIC GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.27k | £51.69k | £23.57k | £26.10k | £23.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.53k | £50.80k | £44.99k | £28.96k | £26.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 9 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 9 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 June 2023 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 May 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 July 2021 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 14 July 2021 | 75 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 JUN 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 MAY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29 APR 2016
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: (A)AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS AND/ OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE THEM TO ATTEND ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTE OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION; (B)PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION, OR TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION, OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. 2.THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Area of benefit
BALI AND KENYA
Contact information
- Address:
-
LYNTON HOUSE
7-12 TAVISTOCK SQUARE
LONDON
WC1H 9BQ
- Phone:
- 07956383065
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window