Financial history THE HOLLOWAY MOSQUE

Charity number: 1132426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £60.15k £65.89k £60.22k £65.97k £71.21k
Total expenditure £65.49k £65.56k £59.54k £56.00k £69.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A