FRIENDS OF MARGRAVINE CEMETERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the "Friends of Margravine Cemetery' is to promote for the public benefit, aspects relating to the conservation of the flora, fauna, monuments, buildings and burial records, of the Margravine Hammersmith Cemetery in London, and the introduction of improvements to the cemetery and its management, so long as they are compatible with the conservation of nature".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 24 August 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES PATRICK WAGNER | Chair | 01 October 2006 |
|
|||||
ROBERT STEPHENSON | Trustee | 20 October 2009 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN MOORE | Trustee | 20 October 2009 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Savery | Trustee | 17 July 2006 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SAVERY | Trustee | 17 July 2006 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.00k | £3.21k | £4.55k | £3.71k | £4.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.69k | £12.42k | £3.25k | £2.73k | £1.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2021 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE CONSERVATION OF THE FLORA, FAUNA, MONUMENTS, BUILDINGS AND BURIAL RECORDS OF THE MARGRAVINE HAMMERSMITH CEMETERY, LONDON AND THE INTRODUCTION OF IMPROVEMENTS TO THE CEMETERY AND ITS MANAGEMENT SO LONG AS THEY ARE COMPATIBLE WITH THE CONSERVATION OF NATURE AND HISTORIC INTEREST.
Area of benefit
HAMMERSMITH
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 ST. DUNSTANS ROAD
LONDON
W6 8RE
- Phone:
- 02087482927
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window