MEGAN VAN'T HOFF CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prevention or relief of poverty. Overseas aid/famine relief. Trust is open to applications. Please submit your application to https://funding.ludlowtrust.com
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 June 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 August 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/02/2020 | 10/02/2021 | 10/02/2022 | 10/02/2023 | 10/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.99k | £42.58k | £31.42k | £34.21k | £68.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.29k | £90.54k | £18.28k | £65.32k | £33.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 June 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 June 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 February 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 February 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 February 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 February 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 February 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 February 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 February 2020 | 15 December 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 February 2020 | 15 December 2020 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
IN THIS CLAUSE "THE CHARITIES'' MEAN SUCH REGISTERED CHARITY OR CHARITIES WHOSE PURPOSE AND AIM IT SHALL BE TO HELP AND BENEFIT FAMINE RELIEF DISASTER AID OR SIMILAR GLOBAL CATASTROPHES AS THE BANK SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ludlow Trust Co Ltd
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
- Phone:
- 01173138200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window