Financial history HEAVEN'S GATEWAY MINISTRIES (SOLUTION GROUND)

Charity number: 1131031
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £371.84k £225.34k £143.78k £167.43k £89.79k
Total expenditure £347.35k £155.21k £122.46k £129.25k £91.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A