THE BRITISH EGYPTIAN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity organises cultural events to highlight the relationship between the United Kingdom and Egypt eg lectures and visits to places of interest such as the Ashmolean Museum in Oxford's new Egyptian Galleries and a private view the Book of the Dead Exhibition in the British Museum (BM). We provide annual sponsorship of £5,000 to the BM to enable museum curators from Egypt to study in London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of London
- Hampshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARONESS SYMONS OF VERNHAM DEAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dina Soliman Pedersen | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennette Deidre Bradbury | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR MAGDY ADIB ISHAK-HANNA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NOEL LESTER RANDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.78k | £8.72k | £16.25k | £17.57k | £4.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.42k | £5.38k | £24.24k | £16.94k | £9.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 AUGUST 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 3 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PEOPLE OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE PEOPLE OF EGYPT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY, ART, MUSIC, LANGUAGE AND LITERATURE OF EGYPT AND OF THE UNITED KINGDOM (PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT THE CHARITY SHALL NOT PROMOTE ENCOURAGE OR PURSUE ANY POLITICAL OBJECT).
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND EGYPT
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 BROWNLOW ROAD
CROYDON
CR0 5JT
- Phone:
- 02086817200
- Email:
- noelrands@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window