Financial history PRODUCERS DIRECT

Charity Number: 1133218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £581.45k £314.97k £988.36k £1.56m £1.10m
Total expenditure £731.21k £578.38k £1.09m £1.72m £1.55m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.75k £17.90k £128.21k £22.06k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £124.00k N/A £223.00k £331.46k £195.14k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £455.92k N/A £765.36k £1.22m £902.37k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.52k N/A £0 £0 £292
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £688.01k N/A £1.02m £1.65m £1.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £43.20k N/A £72.98k £69.98k £66.01k
Expenditure - Governance £17.83k N/A £7.89k £10.19k £11.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0