BIG DIFFERENCE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, maintain, improve and advance education by encouragement of the arts. To promote good health and well-being through the arts. The advancement of the arts and culture for charitable purposes including through comedy and comedy performance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 June 2024
Total income includes £119,305 from 6 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ravi Kotecha | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Jonathan Mark Sutton | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Simon John Brown | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Jessica Southworth | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Traill | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
Robbie Kerr | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Laura Hailstone | Trustee | 31 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||
JONATHAN WILLIAM KERRY | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
Emma Mary Anderson | Trustee | 24 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||
DR MAX SCHURER | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 29/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £355.06k | £288.96k | £346.94k | £326.57k | £473.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £320.58k | £213.71k | £372.74k | £437.51k | £495.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.00k | £185.00k | £24.00k | £24.00k | £119.31k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 31 May 2023 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 31 May 2023 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 NOVEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
3.1. TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS; 3.2. TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AND WELL BEING THROUGH THE ARTS; 3.3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS AND CULTURE FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES INCLUDING THROUGH COMEDY AND COMEDY PERFORMANCE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
LCB DEPOT
31 RUTLAND STREET
LEICESTER
LE1 1RE
- Phone:
- 01162616812
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window