Trustees BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR SUPPORTED EMPLOYMENT
Charity number: 1136395

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Green | Chair | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roshni Shrosbree | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maurice George | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Spurgeon | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shona Claydon | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neryssa Charman | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lee Edward Corless | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Seddon | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ramsay Taylor | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Petra Alexandra Kennedy | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Alistair Kerr | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Stenning | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Britt | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.