LINCOLNSHIRE ASSOCIATION OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILTIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Delvering training on Disability Awareness and the Disability Discrimination Act. Access Auditing to provide recommendations for improvements in line with the DDA and Part M of the Buildings Regulations. Disability awareness in schools presentations, by disabled members Supporting disabled volunteers Representation on roups. Support and advice on disability issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 15 September 2009: Standard registration
- 21 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.58k | £3.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.06k | £39.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 23 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 NOVEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
3.1 TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISABLED PEOPLE IN LINCOLNSHIRE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN DISABILITY. THIS WILL BE ACHIEVED IN PARTICULAR BY: 3.1.1 ENCOURAGING DISABLED PEOPLE TO BE ACTIVELY INVOLVED IN EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DISABILITY; 3.1.2 PROVIDING TRAINING IN DISABILITY AWARENESS AND EQUALITY; 3.1.3 EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN ISSUES RELATING TO DISABILITY AND IN PARTICULAR, EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN WAYS IN WHICH DISCRIMINATION CAN BE ELIMINATED. 3.2 TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND REHABILITATION OF DISABLED PEOPLE. THIS WILL BE ACHIEVED IN PARTICULAR BY: 3.2.1 PROVIDING TRAINING TO DISABLED PEOPLE; 3.2.2 MEETING THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT NEEDS OF INDIVIDUAL DISABLED PEOPLE INCLUDING NEEDS FOR WORK AND RECREATION; 3.2.3 PROMOTING AND ASSISTING THE INCLUSION OF DISABLED PEOPLE IN THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window