PUBLIC WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- The promotion and protection of good health and relief of sickness of the general public in Pakistan and the UK - The advancement of education of the general public and the relief of poverty of people in need, in Pakistan and the UK - To promote Human rights throughout the world - Promotion of religious harmony for the benefit of the public - The promotion of equality and diversity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Pakistan
Governance
- 12 April 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
khalid Mahmood Hfz | Chair | 07 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nargis Noreen | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Manir Ahmed Hfz | Trustee | 06 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zahida Akbar | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sajid Mahmood | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.54k | £7.22k | £7.63k | £11.26k | £6.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.40k | £400 | £3.60k | £11.60k | £24.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 August 2024 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 October 2023 | 251 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 April 2021 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN PAKISTAN AND THE UK, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY WORKING WITH HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, AND RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PEOPLE IN NEED, IN PAKISTAN AND THE UK IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AND TRAINING; 3. TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; = OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; ? RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; = RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; ? RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; = PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; = PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; = INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIED OUT ITS OBJECTS. 4. THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND BY PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS. 5. THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR. DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS; (B) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS ARID PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS.
Area of benefit
PAKISTAN AND THE UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
259 SOMERVILLE ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B10 9DD
- Phone:
- 07470937307
- Email:
- publicwelfaretrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window