DAWAH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE INTERESTS OF PEOPLE OF EUROPE, AFRICA AND SOUTH ASIA BY THE PROVISION OF RESOURCES IN ORDER TO: A) RELIEVE POVERTY, B) ADVANCE EDUCATION, C) EMPOWER WOMEN AND D) PRESERVE AND PROTECT THEIR GOOD HEALTH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 November 2009: Standard registration
- AL-QASWA (Working name)
- CLAY COSMETICS (Working name)
- EN0NE (Working name)
- ISLAMIC DAWAH FOUNDASHION (Working name)
- WAAW (Working name)
- FAIZAN-E-GHAMKOL SHAREEF (Previous name)
- ISLAMIC DAWAH FOUNDASHION (Previous name)
- ISLAMIC DAWAH FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- ISLAMIC DAWAH FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- MUS1IM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE LIVING GROUP (TLG) LTD | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Aabish Saeed | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ferdinand | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Anthony Hughes | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Deborah Smith | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Faizan Ali Khan | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.22k | £8.63k | £9.22k | £8.55k | £5.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.89k | £8.20k | £8.20k | £7.68k | £4.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 February 2022 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/01/2008 AS AMENDED ON 08/10/2009 AS AMENDED ON 03/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 12/12/2011 AS AMENDED ON 01/04/2012 AS AMENDED ON 12/06/2013 AS AMENDED ON 28/10/2013
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH AND ISLAMIC EDUCATION B) TO EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE AND REVERTS (NEW MUSLIMS) ABOUT GOOD MORALS, MANNERS, AND PRINCIPLES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PERSONALITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS PEACEFUL AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. C) THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY AND DIVERSITY BY EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT ISLAM AND PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND UNDER UNDERSTANDING ABOUT THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENCE RELIGIOUS FAITHS, PHILOSOPHICAL BELIEFS AND CULTURES, TO ENABLE COMMUNITIES TO LIVE TOGETHER IN PEACE AND HARMONY. D) ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A COMMUNITY GATHERING PLACE IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Temple Row
BIRMINGHAM
B2 5LS
- Phone:
- 01216439988
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window