THE LULLA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
- United States
Governance
- 14 August 2009: Standard registration
- THE EROS FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KISHORE LULLA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ridhima Lulla | Trustee | 17 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
RISHIKA KISHORE LULLA | Trustee | 17 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
SG KLEINWORT HAMBROS TRUST COMPANY (UK) LIMITED | Trustee |
|
||||||
MANJULA LULLA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.06k | £13.43k | £8.64k | £8.64k | £8.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 451 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 451 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 13 April 2023 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 February 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 31 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY OR APPLY THE ANNUAL INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND TO SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
S G KLEINWORT HAMBROS TRUST COMPANY
5TH FLOOR
8 ST. JAMES'S SQUARE
LONDON
SW1Y 4JU
- Phone:
- 02075973065
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window