Accounts and annual returns LONDON FATWA COUNCIL

Charity number: 1132613
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 30 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 30 April 2025 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 04 May 2024 370 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 04 May 2024 370 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 30 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window