LONDON FATWA COUNCIL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
London Fatwa Council offers legal advice and counselling in accordance with Islamic law on personal issues such as; marriage, divorce and wills to more commercial legal advice in relation to contracts, mortgages and Islamic finance to the Muslim community primarily in Brent and extended to the community in the UK and overseas.The Council works extensively to foster dialogue and cohesion in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
- Brent
- Harrow
Governance
- 09 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammad Yazdani Raza Khan | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Aftab Bashir | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Ismail Khan | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Asim Khan | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.08k | £83.90k | £80.12k | £94.89k | £105.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.33k | £74.78k | £91.07k | £97.23k | £120.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 04 May 2024 | 370 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 04 May 2024 | 370 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 OCTOBER 2009 AS AMENDED ON 21 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) ADVISING ON ISLAMIC LAW; B) PROVIDING MARRIAGE AND FAMILY COUNSELLING; C) PROVIDING CLASSICAL ISLAMIC AND ARABIC EDUCATIONAL CLASSES TO ALL; D) PROVIDING A LOCAL-YOUTH COMMUNITY-CENTRE. 2. THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: A) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS; B) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Sheaveshill Parade
Sheaveshill Avenue
London
NW9 6RS
- Phone:
- 07985463440
- Email:
- info@londonfatwacouncil.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window