UMUEZEGWU COOPERATION ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teaching Igbo people who are British citizens how to speak their native language of "Igbo" and cultural updates.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bromley
- Hounslow
- Lewisham
- Southwark
- Waltham Forest
- Ghana
- Nigeria
Governance
- 22 August 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mathew Ogu | Chair | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Kennedy Chima Ozor Member | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
VALENTINE AGAECHETA | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2019 | 01/10/2020 | 01/10/2021 | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £300 | £500 | £5.00k | £300 | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £5.00k | £10.00k | £4.00k | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | 24 November 2022 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | 06 September 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2019 | 06 September 2021 | 401 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/09/2007 AS AMENDED ON 26/06/2011
Charitable objects
1.TO RELIEVE NEED AND PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG PEOPLE WHO ORIGINATE, OR WHOSE FAMILIES ORIGINATE FROM, FROM UMUEZEGWU IN NIGERIA BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, SUPPORT AND ADVICE CALCULATED TO RELIEVE SOCIAL EXCLUSION. 2.TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, WHO ORIGINATE, OR WHOSE FAMILIES ORIGINATE, FROM UMUEZEGWU IN NIGERIA THROUGH PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 3.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN EASTERN NIGERIA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF APPRENTICE SCHEMES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 Kilross Road
Feltham
TW14 8SB
- Phone:
- 07930137643
- Email:
- DELFSOLAR@YAHOO.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window