AFRICAN CENTRE FOR MINING, ENVIRONMENT AND DEVELOPMENT (AFROMED)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help with the environment & community wellbeing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Ghana
- South Africa
Governance
- 12 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOROTHY APPIAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KWESI ATTA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £100 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 281 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 281 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 October 2021 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 October 2020 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 8 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH IN THE SOCIALLY AND/OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED AFRICAN MINING COMMUNITIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE LIVING ON LAND BEING MINED FOR COAL IN GHANA, WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR PEOPLE IN THESE COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
GHANA
Contact information
- Address:
-
454A High Road
Tottenham
London
N17 9JD
- Phone:
- 02085589835
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window