Financial history UNIQUE KIDZ & CO

Charity number: 1131652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £456.38k £458.45k £492.35k £542.17k £679.89k
Total expenditure £364.23k £301.87k £406.79k £489.00k £590.20k
Income from government contracts £67.43k £59.44k £51.90k £60.35k £56.39k
Income from government grants N/A £82.86k £23.38k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £34.58k £83.84k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £35.74k £42.80k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £465.05k £543.49k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £911 £6.92k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £5.89k £2.84k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £443.79k £538.01k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £45.19k £52.19k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £32 £0