THE CONCORDIA FOUNDATION ARTISTS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
support of young musicians at the beginning of their careers and providing performance opportunities for the wider benefit of the public and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF MUSICIANS | Trustee | 05 September 2009 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.41k | £4.53k | £0 | £2.24k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.46k | £8.61k | £2.16k | £7.41k | £2.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
"1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF MUSIC BY THE PROVISION OF UNDERWRITTEN MUSICAL EVENTS PERFORMED BY HIGHLY TALENTED YOUNG MUSICIANS AT PUBLIC VENUES; AND OR 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MUSICIANS, OVER THE AGE OF 18, WHO (I) ARE BRITISH NATIONALS OR WHO BEING FOREIGN NATIONALS ARE RESIDENT (WHICH SHALL FOR THESE PURPOSES INCLUDE HAVING LEAVE TO REMAIN) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM; AND (II) WHO IN THE CASE OF INSTRUMENTALISTS INCLUDING ACCOMPANISTS ARE NOT OLDER THAN 27 AND IN THE CASE OF SINGERS NOT OLDER THAN 32 ON 30TH JUNE OF THE YEAR OF AUDITION; AND (III) WHO HAVE EITHER COMPLETED THEIR ADVANCED STUDIES OR ARE ENGAGED IN FULL TIME POSTGRADUATE STUDY AND WHO ARE CONSIDERED BY THE TRUSTEES TO HAVE REACHED SUFFICIENT STANDARD OF MUSICAL PERFORMANCE, BY PROVIDING CONCERT AND OR PERFORMANCE OPPORTUNITIES, AND THE AWARD OF PRIZES (COLLECTIVELY CALLED "AWARDS")."
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 SPEED HIGHWALK
BARBICAN
LONDON
EC2Y 8DX
- Phone:
- 02074968980
- Email:
- clerk@wcom.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window