Accounts and annual returns INTERNATIONAL DISASTER VOLUNTEERS

Charity number: 1132011
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2023 05 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 05 November 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 21 June 2020 On Time