INTERNATIONAL DISASTER VOLUNTEERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
International Disaster Volunteers (IDV) is a volunteer driven, England and Wales registered charity that works with communities worldwide which have been affected by or are vulnerable to disaster. Our goals are to help survivors achieve sustainable recovery and build more resilient communities both before and after disaster.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Haiti
- Philippines
Governance
- 06 October 2009: Standard registration
- 23 October 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- EUROPEAN DISASTER VOLUNTEERS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 28/02/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.40k | £42.27k | £22.48k | £10.72k | £42.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.18k | £31.43k | £32.11k | £24.46k | £54.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 21 June 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/08/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/07/2013
Charitable objects
(I) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTERS IN THE FORM OF RECONSTRUCTION AID AND INITIAL RELIEF FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE REMOVAL OF THE UNWANTED AFTER-EFFECTS OF DISASTER (SUCH AS RUBBLE), THE RECONSTRUCTION OF KEY COMMUNITY BUILDINGS, FACILITIES AND HOMES, AND HELPING WITH COMMUNITY ORGANISATION. TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; (C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS "DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS." (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THOSE LIVING IN DISASTER AFFECTED COMMUNITIES IN HOW TO SURVIVE, RECOVER FROM AND IMPROVE THEIR STANDARD AND QUALITY OF LIFE AND FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES FOLLOWING THE OCCURRENCE OF A NATURAL DISASTER. (3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE WHO VOLUNTEER WITH EDV) AS TO THE EFFECTS OF CLIMATE CHANGE AND OTHER ENVIRONMENTAL FACTORS ON WORLD-WIDE DISASTER TRENDS. (IV) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES WORLD-WIDE IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.;
Area of benefit
WORLD-WIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window