Financial history FAMILIES AND BABIES (FAB)

Charity number: 1136594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £750.96k £718.36k £785.66k £776.71k £806.27k
Total expenditure £705.47k £624.38k £742.84k £732.77k £790.56k
Income from government contracts £670.25k £631.60k £686.17k £670.72k £773.21k
Income from government grants N/A £19.41k £22.67k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £5.00k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £105.22k £0
Income - Charitable activities £80.70k £67.35k £76.82k £665.72k £30.05k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1 £0 £0 £775 £3.00k
Income - Other £0 £651.01k £708.83k £0 £773.21k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £657.28k £583.63k £695.41k £691.48k £748.88k
Expenditure - Raising funds £48.18k £0 £47.43k £41.29k £41.69k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £15.19k £0 £103.83k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £41.29k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £40.75k £0 £0 £0