SUBLIME LIFE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The operation of a bus for youth work, with gaming equipment, computers, sound recording studio and more. Detached and centre based work building the capacity, providing education, training and care to young people, children and adults.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 August 2009: Standard registration
- 28 September 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- HOPE FOR ENFIELD YOUTH (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.96k | £80.69k | £93.54k | £42.68k | £15.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.44k | £89.80k | £95.01k | £48.77k | £14.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 18 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 25 September 2017 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2016
(These accounts |
25 September 2017 | 117 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07/02/2012
Charitable objects
A TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY IN ENFIELD AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD A THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE TRUSTEES') MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY B TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AMONGST PEOPLE OF ALL AGES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN ENFIELD AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FITT
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window