BAIT - UL - MALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of children, in particular orphans in countries such as Pakistan. The relief of sickness and preservation of health among people residing permanently or temporarily in Pakistan and other countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- Pakistan
Governance
- 23 June 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hafiz Arfat | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nasir Shams | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hafeez Azhar | Trustee | 17 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/08/2019 | 15/08/2020 | 15/08/2021 | 15/08/2022 | 15/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.16k | £160 | £170 | £484 | £324 | |
|
Total expenditure | £180 | £348 | £324 | £96 | £390 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 August 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 August 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 August 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 August 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, IN PARTICULAR ORPHANS. IN COUNTRIES SUCH AS PAKISTAN. 2) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN PAKISTAN AND OTHER COUNTRIES.
Area of benefit
PAKISTAN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 Chellow Dene View
BRADFORD
West Yorkshire
BD9 6BW
- Phone:
- 07988781139
- Email:
- baitulmall@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window