THE TAVISTOCK TRUST FOR APHASIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance health for the condition of Aphasia;supporting Centres in relation to its work; supporting projects;provide those suffering from Aphasia with support and advance education and raise public awareness of the condition of Aphasia by providing awards and prizes in the field of Aphasia;encourage, support and promote research into this condition or any related subject, for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Australia
- Canada
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 14 September 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DUCHESS HENRIETTA JOAN BEDFORD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Professor Jane Frances Marshall | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN SHURROCK | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Edward Whitley OBE, MCSI | Trustee | 30 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE ROSS | Trustee | 08 August 2012 |
|
|||||
Duke of Bedford Andrew BEDFORD | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR HUGH ALAN CROCKARD | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
|||||
THE HON MRS NICOLE CAMPBELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.09k | £71.68k | £52.58k | £1.17m | £76.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £152.07k | £183.04k | £84.13k | £108.78k | £192.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.14m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £29.57k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £81.47k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £62.56k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £27.31k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE HEALTH IN RELATION TO THE CONDITION OF APHASIA, IN PARTICULAR BY; 3.1.1 ADVANCING THE DIAGNOSIS, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUFFERERS FROM APHASIA, INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, THEIR TREATMENT IN ANY CENTRE OR ELSEWHERE, OR THEIR TREATMENT BY SPEECH AND LANGUAGE THERAPISTS; 3.1.2 SUPPORTING ANY CENTRE IN RELATION TO ITS WORK WITH SUFFERERS FROM APHASIA; 3.1.3 SUPPORTING PROJECTS WHICH ASSIST SUFFERERS FROM APHASIA IN DEVELOPING CONFIDENCE AND LANGUAGE SKILLS; 3.1.4 PROVIDING AWARDS TO THOSE WHO HAVE MADE A SIGNIFICANT CONTRIBUTION IN THE FIELD OF APHASIA; 3.2 PROVIDE THOSE SUFFERING FROM APHASIA WITH SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE IN LIVING WITH APHASIA; 3.3 PROVIDE SUPPORT TO CARERS OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM APHASIA; 3.4 ADVANCE EDUCATION IN, AND RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF, THE CONDITION OF APHASIA, FOR EXAMPLE (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) BY PROVIDING AWARDS AND PRIZES FOR ACADEMIC ESSAYS AND WORK IN THE FIELD OF APHASIA WITH A VIEW TO ENCOURAGING THE STUDY, UNDERSTANDING AND AWARENESS OF APHASIA; 3.5 ENCOURAGE, SUPPORT AND PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THIS CONDITION OR ANY RELATED SUBJECT (AND THE PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH), FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Bedford Office
Woburn
Bedfordshire
MK17 9PQ
- Phone:
- 01525292125
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window