Trustees THE TAVISTOCK TRUST FOR APHASIA
Charity number: 1131611

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DUCHESS HENRIETTA JOAN BEDFORD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Professor Jane Frances Marshall | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN SHURROCK | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Edward Whitley OBE, MCSI | Trustee | 30 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE ROSS | Trustee | 08 August 2012 |
|
|||||
Duke of Bedford Andrew BEDFORD | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR HUGH ALAN CROCKARD | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
|||||
THE HON MRS NICOLE CAMPBELL | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.