PASSION FOR SOULS MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Visitation and encouragement of the Churches in Africa, Ireland and the United Kingdom. Setting up a Christian Book/Coffee Shop, incorporating a Meeting and Healing Room, via its subsidiary company, Cornerstone (St Neots) Ltd.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
- Rwanda
Governance
- 24 August 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL SHINNERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MICHELE SHINNERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.65k | £1.60k | £1.84k | £0 | £2.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.23k | £2.68k | £488 | £406 | £1.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 2 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THROUGHOUT THE REST OF THE WORLD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE HOLDING OF PUBLIC MEETINGS, THE DISTRIBUTION OF LITERATURE AND THE PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. TO RELIEVE POVERTY THROUGH, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE DISTRIBUTION OF RESOURCES SUCH AS FOOD, MEDICAL SUPPLIES AND CLOTHING. TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR EDUCATION THROUGH TEACHING, THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES AND MENTORING OF INDIVIDUALS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 IVEL GARDENS
BIGGLESWADE
SG18 0AN
- Phone:
- 07859342854
- Email:
- paul.shinners@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window