Financial history HUCKNALL SPORTS YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 1132667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £48.00k £19.89k £57.24k £83.95k £78.38k
Total expenditure £38.20k £24.38k £53.28k £73.80k £60.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A