Accounts and annual returns JESUS CELEBRATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1132461
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2013 09 September 2014 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2012 15 August 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2011 17 August 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2011 09 July 2012 On Time