NEWHALL MEETING POINT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A. To advance the education of children in Harlow, Essex by working with the schools in the parishes of Church Langley, and St Mary and St Hugh. B. To advance the Christian religion for the benefit of the public through the setting up of a new Church/Christian Community on the Newhall Estate, in the provision of collective acts of worship and by assisting in the ministries of the parishes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 24 August 2009: Standard registration
- 11 July 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2010 | 30/06/2011 | 31/10/2012 | 31/10/2013 | 31/10/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57 | £24.99k | £12.73k | £33.53k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £38 | £17.90k | £26.82k | £979 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
A TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN IN HARLOW, ESSEX BY WORKING WITH THE SCHOOLS IN THE PARISHES OF CHURCH LANGLEY, HARLOW AND ST MARYS AND ST HUGHES, OLD HARLOW BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF CHRISTIAN RELIGIOUS EDUCATION B TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN HARLOW, ESSEX AND ITS ENVIRONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE SETTING UP OF A NEW CHURCH/CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY ON THE NEWHALL ESTATE, IN THE PROVISION OF COLLECTIVE ACTS OF WORSHIP AND ASSEMBLIES IN THE LOCAL SCHOOLS, AND BY ASSISTING GENERALLY IN THE MINISTRIES OF CHURCH LANGLEY CHURCH AND ST MARYS AND ST HUGHS CHURCH, HARLOW
Area of benefit
HARLOW, ESSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window