HOMES4LIVING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Homes4living is housing provide for clients fleeing domestic violence who dont have resources to public funds. Homes4living also runs a food bank each week feeding around 200 people. We also provide clothing, food parcels and carry out home deliveries for the elderly, vulnerable and disabled clients of our community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
Governance
- 15 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marzena Agnieszka Mazgaj | Chair | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anna Elzbieta Redyk | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Malgorzata Repich Masztafiak | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.08k | £1.40k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.08k | £1.40k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2025 | 357 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 08 May 2021 | 342 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE HARDSHIP, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONGST THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, PARTICULARLY THE HOMELESS AND THOSE WHO ARE LIVING IN ADVERSE HOUSING CONDITIONS, INCLUDING THROUGH (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF: (A) HOUSING OR SHELTER FOR THOSE IN NEED, PROVIDED THAT THIS SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE HOUSING; (B) SOCIAL CARE, SUCH AS ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND CHILDCARE; AND (C) HELP AND ADVICE TO PERSONS IN NEED IN RELATION TO DEBT AND PERSONAL FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT, WELFARE BENEFITS, ACCOMMODATION AND HOMELESSNESS, AND SIMILAR MATTERS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Eldon Place
BRADFORD
BD1 3AZ
- Phone:
- 07815904919
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window