Accounts and annual returns THE CRESCENT PRE SCHOOL NURSERY LTD

Charity number: 1136237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 10 July 2023 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 10 July 2023 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 July 2023 375 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 10 July 2023 375 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 July 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 July 2021 30 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 02 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window