Financial history THE CRESCENT PRE SCHOOL NURSERY LTD

Charity number: 1136237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £339.65k £298.78k £267.18k £292.03k £314.22k
Total expenditure £321.97k £293.09k £305.82k £295.12k £326.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £264.77k
Income from government grants N/A £42.80k £7.91k £3.54k N/A