THE PLAY AND LEISURE OPPORTUNITY LIBRARY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide specialist toys and leisure equipment ifor children and adults with a disability in a lending library servcie. We offer a collection and delivery service as well.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Carmarthenshire
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 18 September 2009: Standard registration
- 20 February 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 20 February 2015: Funds transferred to 1152202 THE PLAY AND LEISURE OPPORTUNITY LIBRARY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/11/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.04k | £25.84k | £39.30k | £45.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.04k | £20.11k | £36.82k | £44.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2013 | 09 February 2015 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2013 | 09 February 2015 | 132 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 30 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | 30 July 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 01 August 2012 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | 05 August 2012 | 6 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 DECEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND EDUCATION OF ALL THOSE CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS WITH A DISABILITY AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF THERAPEUTIC, EDUCATIONAL AND STIMULATING TOYS AND EQUIPMENT TO BE USED IN THE HOME. IN FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OBJECT THE PLAY AND LEISURE LIBRARY SHALL AIM: 1 TO ASSIST THE DEVELOPMENT AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH/WELL BEING OF CHILDREN/YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS WITHA DISABILITY AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF APPROPRIATE PLAY/LEISURE ACTIVITIES 2 TO LEND THEM THE BEST AVAILABLE TOYS AND EQUIPMENT 3 TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY FOR PROFESSIONAL INVOLVEMENT AS APPROPRIATE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window