Accounts and annual returns GOD'S GRACE MINISTRY INCORPORATED

Charity number: 1133211
Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required