Accounts and annual returns RICCALL PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1131511
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 24 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021
Annual return 05 April 2020 24 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 24 October 2020 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2019 20 August 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 20 August 2019 On Time