CALVERT22 FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The mission of the Calvert 22 Foundation is to support and share the contemporary culture and creativity of the new east , Eastern Europe, the Balkans, Russia and Central Asia , enriching perceptions of the region and furthering international understanding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 15 March 2010: Standard registration
- 22 December 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £727.34k | £610.28k | £574.36k | £768.30k | £351.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £731.40k | £446.12k | £523.55k | £636.20k | £273.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £727.32k | £593.00k | £550.00k | £750.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £18.30k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £17 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £17.28k | £24.36k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £731.40k | £424.65k | £514.34k | £612.16k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £11.37k | £4.97k | £9.81k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £10.10k | £4.25k | £14.23k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
I TO PROMOTE ART FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING VENUES FOR THE EXHIBITION AND PROMOTION OF CONTEMPORARY AND MODERN ART FROM RUSSIA AND CENTRAL AND EASTERN EUROPE AND FROM OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AND BY UNDERTAKING AND PROMOTING EXHIBITIONS AND BY COMMISSIONING WORKS FOR EXHIBITION BY CONTEMPORARY ARTISTS, AND II TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN CONTEMPORARY AND MODERN ART FROM RUSSIA AND CENTRAL AND EASTERN EUROPE AND FROM OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF ART GALLERIES AND THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF ART GALLERIES AND THROUGH EXHIBITIONS AND PUBLICATIONS (ELECTRONIC, VIRTUAL AND OTHERWISE) AND BY HOLDING SEMINARS, WEBINARS, DISCUSSIONS, LECTURES, TALKS OR SIMILAR EVENTS
Area of benefit
RUSSIA AND CENTRAL AND EASTERN EUROPE AND FROM OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window