BISMILLAH CULTURAL CENTRE (AFGHAN COMMUNITY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TEACHING OF QURAN: Quran classes for the young continued throughout the year. OTHER ACTIVITIES: Other activities included the relief of poverty, the provision of funeral services to the Muslim community, and the provision of facilities for community development. To advance the religion of Islam in accordance with the teaching of the Quran.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 December 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMAD ZAHIRSHAH | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Mussaweer Shah | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR MOHAMMAD EHSAN MOTMAEN | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.75k | £78.71k | £53.65k | £48.26k | £97.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.54k | £78.21k | £46.44k | £51.69k | £77.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 132 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 April 2023 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 April 2023 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2022 | 346 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2022 | 346 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 30 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND HARDSHIP AMONGST AFGHANISTANIS AND OTHER COMMUNITIES IN THE CROYDON AND SURROUNDING AREA, PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND COUNSELLING . TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF ENGLISH CLASSES AND SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL FOR THE AFGHANISTAN COMMUNITY . TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHING OF QURAN AND SUNNAH
Area of benefit
CROYDON AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 3
1370 London Road
London
SW16 4DE
- Phone:
- 02087646274
- Email:
- POPAL1@LIVE.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window