ALIVE ACTIVITIES LIMITED

Charity Number: 1132708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Alive is dedicated to improving the quality of life of older people and their carers. We work to prioritise wellbeing into later life by engaging older people creatively through meaningful activity, training and supporting carers to enrich the lives of older people, reducing social isolation by connecting them to their local communities and speaking up for the rights of older people

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City
  • Gloucestershire
  • North Somerset
  • Somerset
  • South Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 November 2009: Standard registration
  • 29 March 2017: Funds received from 203553 BRISTOL FILM UNIT FOUNDED BY TOC H
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anisah Mahmood Trustee 15 August 2023
None on record
Peter Lippett Trustee 07 August 2023
None on record
Dr Kevin Woodrow Trustee 03 August 2023
None on record
Richard Crocker Trustee 27 March 2020
None on record
Patricia Jayne Barlow Trustee 27 March 2020
None on record
Suzy Webster Trustee 09 September 2015
None on record
ANDREW SIMON WOOD Trustee 17 September 2014
CHANGING TUNES
Received: On time
SIXTY-ONE
Received: On time
CATHERINE SMITH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £620.61k £557.63k £811.68k £686.34k £772.07k
Total expenditure £642.47k £500.36k £521.64k £800.33k £836.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £301.73k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £166.19k £166.19k
Income - Donations and legacies £355.28k £444.46k £403.74k £289.48k £277.27k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £263.28k £111.98k £406.19k £388.94k £484.74k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £151 £1.19k £1.47k £7.92k £10.07k
Income - Other £1.90k £0 £290 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £525.24k £424.10k £457.85k £729.66k £762.61k
Expenditure - Raising funds £117.24k £76.26k £63.79k £70.67k £73.76k
Expenditure - Governance £1.66k £2.48k £2.94k £3.99k £3.67k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £41.00k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/10/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £192.02k £223.41k £635.61k £425.80k £357.71k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £39.83k £13.96k £136.12k £40.29k £36.51k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 04 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 04 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE CREATE CENTRE
SMEATON ROAD
BRISTOL
BS1 6XN
Phone:
0117 377 4756